Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shirley Godfrey, Shirley Jo Godfrey As Executrix Of The Estate Of Robert C. Godfrey, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Belluck, Joseph Warren, Dymond, Seth A, Macrides, Michael Alexander, Papain, William Nestor, against Algoma Hardwoods, Inc., American Biltrite, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Amtico Floors, A.O. Smith Water Products, Basic, Inc., Bird Incorporated F K A Bird & Son, Inc., (total of 37) See All represented by Alford, Kirsten Beth, Alzadon Moor, Rula D, Babinecz, Stephen Michael, Calcagno, Terance Rowe, Careathers, Benjamin Lowell, (total of 48) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Margaret Chan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2015 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Time To Trial1379 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1385 days |
Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc, Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, A Pennsylvania Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Domco Products Texas, Inc., D B A Tarkett Inc., Individually And As Successor To Azrock Industries, Inc.
Ecr International, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Dunkirk, Dunkirk Boilers, And Utica Boilers
Honeywell International, Inc., Individually And F K A Alliedsignal, Inc., And As Successor In Interest To The Bendix Corp.
ANSWER
Date: November 12, 2015ANSWER
Date: October 27, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 17, 2015ANSWER
Date: October 16, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 24, 2015ANSWER
Date: April 14, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 04, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 22, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 28, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 14, 2015ANSWER
Date: September 23, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 26, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 15, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 10, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 28, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 20, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 13, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 23, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 04, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 23, 2015ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 08, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #008)
Date: April 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #006)
Date: December 18, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: April 22, 2019NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: April 16, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #007)
Date: April 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #011)
Date: May 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 12, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 22, 2016ANSWER
Date: October 07, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 11, 2016ANSWER
Date: October 05, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 18, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 28, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 31, 2016ANSWER
Date: November 05, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 26, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 23, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 04, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: September 15, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 22, 2016ANSWER
Date: April 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2016ANSWER
Date: April 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2016ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2016ANSWER
Date: November 02, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 06, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 28, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 18, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 14, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 15, 2017ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: July 22, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 28, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 26, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 20, 2017ANSWER
Date: October 13, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2016ANSWER
Date: November 02, 2015ANSWER
Date: October 28, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 01, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 03, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 16, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 31, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 23, 2016ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 19, 2016ANSWER
Date: October 05, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #011)
Date: May 28, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 11, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 29, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: October 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: December 11, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: May 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: October 30, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 08, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 14, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 13, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 27, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 25, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: October 19, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 12, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #004)
Date: November 08, 2017ANSWER
Date: October 05, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 16, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 13, 2015ANSWER
Date: November 05, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 29, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 14, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 25, 2015ANSWER
Date: November 19, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 13, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 16, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 26, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 24, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #010)
Date: May 02, 2019ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: September 14, 2016ANSWER
Date: October 08, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 06, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 04, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 23, 2015ANSWER
Date: October 08, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: May 28, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #002)
Date: September 15, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #011)
Date: May 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 28, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 01, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 21, 2016ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2017ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 28, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 13, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 27, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: November 07, 2017ANSWER
Date: May 24, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: November 20, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: December 11, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: October 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
Date: February 12, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #005)
Date: February 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 14, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: February 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004)
Date: January 30, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: October 30, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 24, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: November 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: February 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: October 06, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: October 30, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #010)
Date: May 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #009)
Date: May 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: May 08, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: October 06, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: April 16, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #011)
Date: May 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: April 29, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: April 10, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 30, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #007)
Date: May 07, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #010)
Date: May 02, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #006)
Date: October 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #011)
Date: May 17, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 20, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 13, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #008)
Date: May 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: December 12, 2018STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: February 04, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #008) *Corrected*
Date: April 23, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #010)
Date: May 01, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: April 22, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 30, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: May 28, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #007)
Date: May 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 10, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: February 04, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 05, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: May 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007)
Date: May 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: October 30, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 12, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Executed Stipulation Discontinuing Action with Prejudice per Settlement as to Defendant American Bil |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 17, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 33 10AM Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE American Biltrite Inc.'s Letter Response to Plaintiff's MIL re Article 16 |
|
June 13, 2019 | Hearing |
ON TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 33 11:00AM Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Davis Video Depo Transcript |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Schier Video Depo Transcript |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - McGlynn - Shulman Decision of Post-trial motions |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Response to Plaintiff's MIL to Preclude Testimony of Schier and Davis |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Response to Plaintiff's Letter Motion in Limine that American Biltrite is jointly and several |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.