Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Karen G. Wysong, Lowell Wysong, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Meirowitz, Samuel Miles, Wasserberg, Daniel Joshua, against Aerco International, Inc., Air & Liquid Corporation, As Successor-By-Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Atwood & Morrill Company, Aurora Pump Company, Bath Iron Works Corporation, (total of 35) See All represented by Cook, Kerryann Marie, Coughlan, Timothy, Dilonardo, Anna M., Dimarco, Erik Christopher, Goodearl, David James, (total of 17) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Manuel J. Mendez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeManuel J. Mendez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Cbs Corporation F K A Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Flowserve Us, Inc., Solely As Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc., And Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Fmc Corporation, Individually, And As Successor To Chicago Pump Company, Northern Pump Company, And Peerless Pump Company
ANSWER
Date: March 23, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 18, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 11, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 10, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 29, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 18, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 15, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: June 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: June 15, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 15, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 12, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 11, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 11, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 11, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 26, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 12, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 12, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 12, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 19, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 19, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 05, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ALSC/BUF Answer to Complaint |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Decision & Order |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Hopeman Brothers Answer |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) FW - Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
June 23, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.