Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fox Paine Capital Fund Ii International, L.P., Fox Paine & Company, Llc, Fox Paine International Gp, Ltd., Fp International Lph, L.P., Saul A Fox, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Enforce Subp - Cplr 3119) case represented by Shimkoski, Hal Martin, against Mitchell Presser, represented by Janghorbani, Jaren, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lyle E. Frank presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLyle E. Frank Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Enforce Subp - Cplr 3119) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
|
Fox Paine & Company, LLC, et al. v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company, et al.
This is a petition to compel compliance with a subpoena ad testificandum served on Mitchell Presser
pursuant to CPLR §§ 3124 and 2308 to appear for a deposition in the acti...
NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 07, 2023LETTER APPLICATION TO ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT (RELATED ACTION)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 07, 2023PETITION
Date: December 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Exhibit E - Opposition to Motion to Compel |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Affirmation of Hal M. Shimkoski in Support of Petition to Compel and in Opposition to Respondent's C Affirmation of Hal M. Shimkoski in Support of Petition to Compel and in Opposition to Respondent's C ... show more |
||
January 03, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Petitioners' Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motionto Compel Compliance with Subpoena Ad Tes Petitioners' Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motionto Compel Compliance with Subpoena Ad Tes ... show more |
||
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS MOTION TO QUASH NON-PARTY SUBPOENA AND IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS MOTION TO QUASH NON-PARTY SUBPOENA AND IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS ... show more |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #002) Oct 27 email at 2:43 pm |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #002) Foxs Ex Parte Application in SF Court |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #002) November 13 email at 4:00 pm |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #002) November 27 email at 11:33 am |
||
December 28, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF CROSS MOTION TO QUASH NON-PARTY SUBPOENA AND IN OPPOSITION TO PETITI MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF CROSS MOTION TO QUASH NON-PARTY SUBPOENA AND IN OPPOSITION TO PETITI ... show more |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #002) Foxs Verified Petition to Compel as to Doebele |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.