Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mark E. Pruzansky M.D. P.C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Giusti, Robert F, against Raquel M Acuna, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Debra A. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time1207 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: August 30, 2017COURT NOTICE
Date: March 04, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 05, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 14, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 13, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 05, 2020 | Hearing |
DISMISSED PRE-NOTE IAS PART 59 22 NYCER 202.27 Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
February 25, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 9:30 AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
January 14, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 9:30 AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
December 03, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 9:30 AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
November 19, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 9:30 AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
October 08, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 59 9:30 AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
July 17, 2019 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 11, 2019 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) ADJOURNED FOR WORKING COPIES MOT Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
March 04, 2019 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.