Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
L'Etoile Royale, Inc., Starnet Insurance Company As Subrogee Of L’Etoile Royale, Inc., Starnet Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Letoile Royale, Inc., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Greenberg, Eliot Lawrence, Grossman, Brett Matthew, Grossman, Michael Frederick, against Campustar, Douglas Elliman Property Management, represented by Price, Jessica Grace, Somerstein, Bruce, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Mary V. Rosado presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management376 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 06, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #003)
Date: December 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 24, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: December 05, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 08, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 30, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 29, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2015CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: February 01, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 02, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 10, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 08, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 10, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002)
Date: May 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002)
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002)
Date: May 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: October 07, 2019URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #002)
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003)
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #004)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004)
Date: January 11, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #004)
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004)
Date: January 31, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #004)
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2015ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 29, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 31, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 12, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003)
Date: September 24, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 03, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 22, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 12, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 25, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2015ORDER - AMENDED
Date: October 03, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 30, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 09, 2020ORDER - AMENDED
Date: June 12, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 24, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affirmation Of Service |
||
January 24, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 11, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) Order To Show Cause To Be Relieved As Counsel |
||
January 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #004) Affirmation In Support Of Order To Show Cause To Be Relieved As Counsel |
||
January 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Pleadings |
||
January 11, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
January 11, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #004) Statement Of Authorization |
||
January 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #004) Affirmation of Good Faith Pursuant to Uniform Court Rules Section 202.7 (f) |
||
January 12, 2021 | Hearing |
REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 2:00PM TEAMS CONF MEDIATION Judge: CANNATARO, ANTHONY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.