Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Berton Forman Md, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kutner, Kenneth Louis, against Catholic Health Services Of Long Island, Mercy Medical Center, represented by Dantonio, Thomas S, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Eileen Bransten presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEileen Bransten Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions643 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time643 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 15, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: September 17, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 07, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: September 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: September 17, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 25, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 09, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #003)
Date: September 17, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 24, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 21, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 28, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 09, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: August 18, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: March 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 18, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 21, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #004)
Date: March 16, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #004)
Date: March 20, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: April 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: April 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: September 17, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #003)
Date: September 18, 2014LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 22, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)
Date: March 19, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 24, 2015MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 06, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: September 24, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #004)
Date: March 20, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 23, 2015MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 30, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 07, 2014LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 19, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: April 07, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) | |
September 21, 2015 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION IAS PART 3 Judge: BRANSTEN, EILEEN |
|
September 16, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 3EFM Judge: BRANSTEN, EILEEN |
|
August 12, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 3EFM Judge: BRANSTEN, EILEEN |
|
April 08, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) EFILED COMMERCIAL SUBM CAL Judge: BRANSTEN, EILEEN |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.