Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Todd Selbert, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Metz, Jeffrey R, Pashman, Scott J, against 150 E 78Th Llc, David Zobel, Loretto Realty Corp., Teodora Zobel, represented by Contos, Michael Todd, Rosenberg, David, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Geoffrey D Wright presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 10, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time246 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: January 15, 2016ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 06, 2015MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: June 10, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 26, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 10, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 02, 2015NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 17, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: February 25, 2016PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: February 24, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: December 09, 2015RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 10, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 16, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001)
Date: July 17, 2015PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: October 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 10, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 16, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: October 06, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 16, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 02, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 24, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: June 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL Stipulation Withdrawing Notice of Appeal dated February 25, 2016 |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Withdrawing Notice of Appeal filed October 6, 2015 |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected* Notice of Appeal |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Pre-Argument Statement | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on February |
|
January 19, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR REPLY Judge: WRIGHT, GEOFFREY D. |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.