Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John B Pegram v. Metropolitan Transportation Authority
On June 11, 2024 a special proceedings - cplr article 78 case was filed by John B Pegram, against Metropolitan Transportation Authority, in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge John J. Kelley presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 11, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 14, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Agency Action
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Corrected
Date: Jun 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: Jun 11, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 001)
Date: Jun 11, 2024RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Jun 11, 2024PETITION
Date: Jun 11, 2024ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Jun 11, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) FOIL Request No. R002642-012824 Message History |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) FOIL Request No. R003301-031724 Message History |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #001) Petitioners Letter to MTA Appeal Officer Requesting Reconsideration |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #001) MTA Final Decision in R003301-031724 |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #001) COOG Advisory Opinion |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Petitioners Appeal in R002642-012824 |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Petitioners Appeal in R003301-031724 |
|
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) MTA Final Decision in R002642-012824 |
|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *Corrected* | |
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) |