Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Zurich American Insurance Company A S O 250 Broadway Associates Corp. And 250 Broadway Owner Llc, As Successor-In-Interest By Restructuring And Or Merger To 250 Broadway Associates Corp., filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Huberman, David S, against East Coast Mechanical Contracting Corp., represented by Cueter, Matthew Peter, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo S. Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management109 days |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Failure To Secure/Inspect) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
ANSWER
Date: July 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2020ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: August 25, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: August 25, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 25, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2020ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 25, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 30, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 12, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 06, 2021 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
April 02, 2021 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 10, 2021 | Hearing |
REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 10:00 A.M. REMOTE CONFERENCE Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
October 02, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 25, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 4:00 P.M. SEE NYSCEF DOC. #11 Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
August 25, 2020 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
August 25, 2020 | Affirmation in Support of Request for Preliminary Conference | ||
August 25, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.