Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cedar Advance Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bouskila, Ariel, against Coolisys Technologies Inc., Digital Farms Inc., Digital Power Inc, Dpw Holdings Inc, Dpw Ventures Inc, (total of 9) See All represented by Volynsky, Robert Brian, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Laurence Love presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurence Love Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 01, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 08, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 16, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 08, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 02, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 02, 2020SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI
Date: June 08, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 01, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 09, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: LOVE, LAURENCE L. |
|
October 09, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR NOPP Judge: LOVE, LAURENCE L. |
|
October 07, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) MOTION SUPPORT OFFICE NOPP Judge: LOVE, LAURENCE L. |
|
July 24, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR PNDG RE Judge: KENNEDY, TANYA R. |
|
July 20, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) TRIAL SUPPORT OFFICE NYSCEF DOC# 25 Judge: KENNEDY, TANYA R. |
|
July 16, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 06, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: KENNEDY, TANYA R. |
|
July 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICROPHASE CORPORATION |
||
July 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE I.AM INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.