Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Stephen Pasterino, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Alvarez, Cristina, Bloch, Michael Low, White, Benjamin Daniel, against P.Volve Llc, Rachel Katzman, represented by Argyle, Benjamin Preisendanz, Deitz, Alexandra Eva Noelle Hofmann, Katsiris, Konstantinos Dimitrios, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Dakota D. Ramseur presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDakota D. Ramseur Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fa/Mp/Def./Ap/Iied) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 31, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F-1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F-3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 19, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: June 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D-1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 31, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Decision on Appeal of Motion to Dismiss in Zeitlin v. Cohan |
||
July 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E - Summary Chart |
||
July 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Project Veritas Appeal - Discovery Stay Order |
||
July 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation of Konstantinos (Kostas) D. Katsiris |
||
July 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F-1 (Motion #001) Exhibit F-1 - Recording Transcript 1 |
||
July 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Krause Reply Affidavit |
||
July 28, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
July 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - SmartMatic USA - Trial Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.