Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Scott W Wright P.C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wright, Scott W., against Financial Services Llc,, Housing Llc,, Ken Mackay, Michael Shore, Ms Global,, (total of 8) See All represented by Delillo, Lorenzo Vincent, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 08, 2012 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1307 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: August 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: August 05, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 28, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 26, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 08, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 16, 2013ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2012STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 07, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 03, 2013STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 08, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 17, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 05, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 16, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: December 03, 2013STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 05, 2013ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #003)
Date: August 13, 2014COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 29, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 07, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2012STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 13, 2012ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001)
Date: September 07, 2012STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #003)
Date: November 20, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: September 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #003) | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Exhibit |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #003) Certificate |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B - Response to Subpoena Musden |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A - Response to Subpoena MS Global |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Opposition |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #003) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.