Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Strathmore Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Harlington Realty Co., Llc, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Finn, Robert J, against Harlington Realty Co., Llc., Mr. & Mrs. Uniforms, L.L.C., represented by Travis, Maximilian Douglas, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Richard G. Latin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard G. Latin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This is a subrogation action whereby Strathmore Insurance Company seeks to recoup payments made to its insured, Harlington Realty Co., LLC as a result of a fire that occurred at a building it owns and damages suffered to the building as a result. It...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 19, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 19, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: December 19, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 05, 2023SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019)
Date: October 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 19, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
December 19, 2023 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 19, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) 22 NYCRR 202.7(f) Notice to Opposing Counsel |
||
December 19, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
October 05, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 05, 2023 | SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019) | ||
April 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.