Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Celeste Frank, Jonathan Scott Frank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stern, Howard, against Christine Ferreira Lyn A K A Christine Lyn, Mark Lyn, represented by Cohen, Michael Ross, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Louis L. Nock presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 02, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 02, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 02, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 11, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: April 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 02, 2021BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: April 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022JUDGMENT - MONEY
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 20, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 09, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 09, 2022JUDGMENT (AMENDED)
Date: March 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
March 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT (AMENDED) entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 30, 2022 | ||
March 28, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 24, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
March 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Copies of Checks from Defendant Ferreira Lyn Redacted per 22 NYCRR Copies of Checks from Defendant Ferreira Lyn Redacted |
||
March 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Email from Real Estate Rental Broker Redacted per 22 NYCRR Email from Real Estate Rental Broker Redacted |
||
March 09, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendant Ferreira Lyn's Order to Show Cause to Vacate Default Judgment Affirmation in Opposition to Defendant Ferreira Lyn's Order to Show Cause to Vacate Default Judgment ... show more |
||
March 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Copy of Decision + Order in Turnover Action |
||
March 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Copy of Marshal's Report on Contents of Safe Deposit Box (Empty) Copy of Marshal's Report on Contents of Safe Deposit Box (Empty) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.