Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Dennis Morgan, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Werner, Michael Shea, against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., L.L.C., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc., Sanofi Us Services Inc., represented by Caterina, Jessica Rubin, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Martin Shulman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1674 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 14, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2017RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA)
Date: June 04, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2017ANSWER
Date: December 12, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
August 30, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE STATUS CONFERENCE 1 Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN (MT) |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause to be Relieved as Counsel |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Summons & Verified Short Form Complaint |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Case Expenses |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Affirmation Pursuant to 22 NYCRR Section 202 |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation of Michael S. Werner |
|
November 16, 2017 | Motion |
SUBST/RELIEVE/WITHDRAW/PROHAC (Motion #001) Decided: 08/23/2018SEE DECISION Before Justice: SHULMAN, MARTIN (MT) Answer demanded: No Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN (MT) |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
January 01, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 1EFM Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN (MT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.