Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Govind R. Vaghashia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gelhaar, Ned Morrison, against Nidhi Vaghashia, represented by Lovelace, Othiamba Nkosi, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Alexander M. Tisch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
PETITION
Date: January 13, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 18, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 31, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter dated Feb 16 |
||
March 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001) Aff of Respondents employer in Opp to OSC |
||
March 01, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter dated Feb 28 |
||
February 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) George Aff with exhibits |
||
January 31, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Aff of Lovelace with Exhibit |
||
January 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
January 31, 2022 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.