Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Revenued, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen, Theodore J, against Kenneth Johnson-Bey, K.N.D. Pest Management, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Rhonda E Fischer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed by REVENUED, LLC against K.N.D. PEST MANAGEMENT, LLC and Kenneth Johnson-Bey. The complaint alleges breach of contract and breach of guarantee. According to the complaint, REVENUED, LLC entered into an agreeme...
AFFIRMATION
Date: December 01, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 12, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 01, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 01, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 12, 2023 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 12, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION KENNETH JOHNSON-BEY is not in the Armed Services |
||
December 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B |
||
December 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A |
||
December 01, 2023 | Affidavit of Default | ||
December 01, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.