Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bethpage Federal Credit Union,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Bethpage Federal Credit Union, Capital One, National Association, Successor To Greenpoint Bank,, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint,, Maria Williams A K A Maria E. Williams, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff is Bethpage Federal Credit Union, and the defendants are Maria Williams, Timothy Williams, Bethpage Federal Credit Union, New York State Department...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: September 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 26, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: September 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 26, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 27, 2023 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI |
||
October 27, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
October 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aoa "JOHN DOE 1" THROUGH "JOHN DOE 12" |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos BETHPAGE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE om 3057 BROWER AVENUE OCEANSIDE NY 11572 |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 MARIA WILLIAMS |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 TIMOTHY WILLIAMS |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos MARIA WILLIAMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.