Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Antonio J. Lapenta, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Raphaelson, Howard Andrew, against Eb Construction Group Llc, Engel Burman, represented by Fogarty, Thomas Ethan, Sejour, Delilah C., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Antonio J. Lapenta, is suing the defendants, EB Construction Group LLC and Engel Burman, for alleged violations. The plaintiff is represented by ...
THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | ||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B |
||
November 03, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint |
||
October 19, 2023 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer |
||
September 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EB CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC |
||
September 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Engel Burman |
||
September 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.