Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Chedva Benelyahou, Sharok Jacobi, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sheehan, Spencer, against Village Of Saddle Rock, represented by Casey, Maureen, Layer, Timothy Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Rhonda E Fischer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRhonda E Fischer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Civil Rights Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 31, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 06, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2023SUMMONS
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - CC (Motion #001) letter local law filing |
||
January 31, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - BB (Motion #001) em from Ct adj pltf mtn |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - AA (Motion #001) Answer |
||
December 11, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Firm Resume |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Proposed Notice |
||
December 11, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
December 11, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
December 11, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.