Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
United Auto Credit Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Connors, Mary Mcauley, Tompsett, Kevin W, against Paola K. Matos, represented by Attorney Opted Out Of Efiling, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Thomas Feinman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time637 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2016NOTICE
Date: January 25, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 17, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 17, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 17, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 28, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 28, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: November 28, 2016BILL OF COSTS
Date: November 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 17, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 23, 2016ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2016ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 07, 2016NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: September 14, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Sevice by Mail |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Notice of Settlement w/ Proposed Jdgmt |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B NOE of Settlement and Proposed Judgment and Mailing |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry of Order and Mailing |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry & copy of Order | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing of NOE & Order | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Settlement & Proposed Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.