Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Doris Cespedes, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jaffe, Richard S., against Gustavo Lemus Sayes, represented by Egan, Deirdre, Martine, Anthony D., Struller, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Dawn Jimenez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDawn Jimenez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2024STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2024STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 23, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 12, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 09, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023MARKED PLEADINGS
Date: October 27, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 09, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306-C Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 15, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 14, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 26, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 14, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 14, 2023MARKED PLEADINGS
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Police Report |
||
January 24, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Defendants Affirmation in Opposition to SJ |
||
January 23, 2024 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
January 12, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
January 09, 2024 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT COURT DIRECTIVES HEREIN |
||
December 12, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Stipulation Adjourning Plaintiff's MSJ |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affidavit in English & Spanish, Google Maps photo and Translator Affidavit |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Efiled Preliminary Conference Order |
||
November 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.