Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cig, Llc D B A Elevations Shoring, Llc, Cig, Llc D B A Elevations Shoring, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lareddola, Robert J, against Danley Harrison, New York Rising Housing Recovery Program, Paula Harrison A K A Paula Campbell, Paula Harrison A K A Paula Campbell, represented by Browser, Adam Lawrence, Constants, Alfred C., Harrison, Paula, Lee, Seung Woo, Masini, Mark I, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Conrad D Singer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 29, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 21, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 05, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 10, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: September 30, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 10, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 19, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 09, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 14, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: March 23, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 18, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 10, 2020SUMMONS
Date: July 24, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 12, 2021BOND/UNDERTAKING
Date: December 03, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2020NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: March 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4) *Corrected*
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 03, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4) Front and Back of Check Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 10, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 10, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 10, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 06, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 22, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 07, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17A Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-D Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4) Decision and Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 03, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #008)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 30, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 30, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: August 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
September 19, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #007) # 8 decided herein as well |
||
July 05, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #008) Reply Affidavit in Further Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #008) Variance |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #008) Request for Scope of Work Change |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #007) Expungement of Criminal Record |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #008) March 2019 Emails |
||
June 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #008) Emails Re 6100 Sept 2018 |
||
June 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #007) Final Invoice 6100 Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.