Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Afs Capital Llc, Associated Supermarket Group, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Perlstein, Allen, against Country Farm Market Inc. D B A Rockland Great Farm, Country Farm Market Inc. D B A Rockland Great Farm, Jae Hyuk Chang, Tae Hong Lee, Young Chung Chun A K A Steve Y Chung, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with James Mccormack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 22, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 05, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 22, 2020BILL OF COSTS
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: July 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: April 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 25, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 08, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 17, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 28, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 28, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 30, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) with Warrant of Commitment for Civil Contempt & Affidavit of Service |
||
May 25, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER warrant of commitment for civil contempt |
||
May 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Personal service of Notice of Entry on Jae Hyuk Chang |
||
May 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of service of Notice of Entry on Tae Hong Lee |
||
May 08, 2023 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #3) *Corrected* Proposed Warrant for Arrest & Commitment Tae Hong Lee |
||
May 08, 2023 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #3) *Corrected* Proposed Warrant for Arrest & Commitment Jae Hyuk Chang |
||
April 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry with decision and affidavit of service |
||
April 21, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Service on Jae Hyuk Chang |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.