Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brian Jackson, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Barnhorn, David Donald, Romero, Peter Arcadio, against Ferguson Enterprises, Llc, represented by Aibel, Matthew Savage, Gage, Kenneth William, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Thomas Rademaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Rademaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (New York Labor Law Claims) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 01, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 08, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement |
||
October 24, 2023 | Notice of Entry with Order | ||
October 18, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement |
||
October 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Requests For Exclusion Forms |
||
October 11, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Memorandum of Law Regarding Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement |
||
October 11, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) *Corrected* Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Declaration of Jennifer Mills for Rust Consulting, Inc. |
||
October 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint |
||
October 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Amended Exhibit E -- Invoices for Litigation Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.