Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Newtek Small Business Finance, Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Boyd, J'Naia Lenore, against Michael J Liberman, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Jerome C. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJerome C. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
|
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Guarantee Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 30, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 26, 2020BILL OF COSTS
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 05, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 20, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 17, 2021SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI
Date: June 30, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Acceleration Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: December 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Loan Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 30, 2020ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: June 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: November 25, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Notice of Entry of Judgment | ||
September 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | ||
August 27, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 23, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) Invoices |
||
May 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affidavit of Peter Persichette |
||
May 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Note |
||
May 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.