Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stephen Gardner Derivatively O B O Lyncrest Gardens Co., Llc, Stephen Gardner Derivatively O B O Lyncrest Gardens Co., Llc, William Slepoy Derivatively O B O Lyncrest Gardens Co., Llc, William Slepoy Derivatively O B O Lyncrest Gardens Co., Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Carney-Cole, Kathryn M, Sluka, Peter Jonathan, Wicks, James M, against Andrew Slepoy, Herbert Slepoy Corporation, Kent Leffel, Lyncrest Gardens Co., Llc Nominal Defendant, Lyncrest Gardens Co., Llc Nominal Defendant, (total of 5) See All represented by Cummings, Anthony W, Dooley, Christopher Paul, Feldman, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Timothy Driscoll presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management146 days |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 12, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: June 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: November 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 12, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 12, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 12, 2020ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: July 29, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: November 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: June 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Steinmetz Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 18, 2020SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: November 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 08, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: November 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 30, 2022TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 27, 2022TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 21, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 05, 2022TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: January 12, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 18, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 15, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 16, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 22, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 02, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: November 12, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
November 02, 2022 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
November 01, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
November 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Court Notice (NYSCEF Doc # 83) and Correspondence upon Kent Leffel |
||
October 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 30, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 27, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 26, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 14, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected* Stipulation of Substitution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.