Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Bethpage Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Dell'Amore, Frank C, against Cooperfriedman Electric Supply Co., Inc. D B A Cooper Electric Supply Co, Daniel Rokach, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc, Id Lighting Solutions Inc., Islip Real Estate Group Llc, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2024 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint involves a commercial mortgage foreclosure action filed by Bethpage Federal Credit Union against multiple defendants, including Islip Real Estate Group LLC, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Daniel Rokach, Dollar Tree ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: April 10, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: April 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Letter dated March 29, 2024
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Default Notice Letter dated February 21, 2024
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Promissory Note
Date: April 02, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon John Doe No. I a/k/a Valley Stream Deli & Grill a/k/a B&K Deli |
||
April 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon T & N Deli & Grill Inc. |
||
April 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon ID Lighting Solutions Inc. |
||
April 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon Cooperfriedman Electric Supply Co., Inc. d/b/a Cooper Electric Supply Co |
||
April 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. |
||
April 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon New York State Department of Taxation and Finance |
||
April 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon Islip Real Estate Group LLC |
||
April 10, 2024 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) | ||
April 10, 2024 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) Notice of Pendency |
||
April 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Guaranty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.