Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Alex Reiter, Michael Reiter, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kasell, David M, against Bank Of America, Gold Coast Maserati, represented by Bock, Jennifer J., Mactiernan, Kevin Thomas, Massand, Shan Prakash, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Francis Ricigliano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis Ricigliano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Fraud, Misrepresentation) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 30, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 17, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 04, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 17, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 17, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Purchase Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 10, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 10, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 31, 2023SUMMONS
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
December 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 05, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Decision for motions #1 & #2 |
||
May 24, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
May 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
May 05, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
May 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Assignment |
||
May 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) S&C |
||
May 04, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.