Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ilham Afifi, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Bowman, Dustin B., against Ahmed Zaky, represented by Falkowski, Michal, Richland, Daniel H., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Danielle M Peterson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2024 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Constructive Trust) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeTrusts |
AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: February 09, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Signed |
||
February 15, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation pursuant to NYCRR 202.7(f) |
||
February 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 9/23/2003 Deed to Nonparty Sherif |
||
February 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) 5/4/2015 Deed from Nonparty Sherif to Plaintiff |
||
February 15, 2024 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Verified Complaint |
||
February 15, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Emergency Order to Show Cause |
||
February 15, 2024 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Emergency Order to Show Cause |
||
February 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) 4/15/2005 Mortgage of Nonparty Sherif |
||
February 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) NYCRR 202.7(f) Notice w/ E-mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.