Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Christopher Sager, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Becker, Monica Paige, Dekel, Monica Paige, Rosner, Allen Jay, Shahabian, Jonathan Paul, against Drexel University, Frontpage Investments D B A Yousef Habibian, represented by Cascone, Leonard Michael, Chou, Elaine N, Greenfield, Matthew Jordan, Kretzing, Laurel Row, Laurent, Christine Isabella, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Thomas Rademaker presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management210 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Other) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 17, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 12, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: October 02, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: June 02, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 12, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 20, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 11, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: July 23, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 22, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 22, 2019ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 19, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 27, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 08, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: May 22, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 06, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 19, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: May 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 24, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 06, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 20, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 20, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 27, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 17, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: September 27, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 19, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 23, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 23, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 09, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 11, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 09, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 30, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
August 16, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 11, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Advising of Stay |
||
August 10, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY | ||
August 10, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation of Steven R. Schlesinger, Esq. in Support of Order to Show Cause to be Relieved Dated Au Affirmation of Steven R. Schlesinger, Esq. in Support of Order to Show Cause to be Relieved Dated Au ... show more |
||
August 09, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Retainer Agreement |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Emergency Affirmation of Laurel R. Kretzing, Esq. in Support of Order to Show Cause Dated August 8, Emergency Affirmation of Laurel R. Kretzing, Esq. in Support of Order to Show Cause Dated August 8, ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.