Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D B A Champion Mortgage Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Christie, Monica G., Fusco, Emma Louise, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Polowy, Amy E., (total of 8) See All against Demetria Ramsey, Myrtle Ramsey, Nassau County Clerk, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, People Of The State Of New York, (total of 8) See All represented by Schwartz, Beth Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 07, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 31, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 20, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 07, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 11, 2020ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: April 28, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 13, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 07, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 11, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: January 31, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2019ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE
Date: July 29, 2019ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2019AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: February 07, 2020ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE
Date: June 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE
Date: April 16, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 04, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: March 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01) Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01) Affidavit of Mailing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #01) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #01) Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01) Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #01)
Date: February 07, 2020HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: January 05, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: March 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #01) Summons with RPAPL 1320 Notice & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #01) HUD-1 Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) | ||
November 10, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 29, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 24, 2021 | HARDSHIP DECLARATION | ||
March 22, 2021 | HARDSHIP DECLARATION | ||
February 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 05, 2021 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION | ||
July 14, 2020 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE STAT PT (STATUS)
Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.