Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gallo, David A, Goldstein, Robyn Erica, against Eduardo Castro, Marlon Castro, Paola Castro, represented by Weiss, Ronald D., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 13, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 13, 2022REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 22, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 27, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 04, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 27, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5) Exhibit I
Date: December 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 13, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 13, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 23, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Exhibit E -S&C, LP, COM |
||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #5) Exhibit I- Oath & Report |
||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Exhibit F- Affidavit of Service |
||
February 13, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #5) Affirmation In Opposition To Defendant's Order To Show Cause |
||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #5) Exhibit S - AOS Motion To Reargue MSJ |
||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #5) Exhibit R- Referee's Report of Sale and Sale Docs |
||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #5) Exhibit H -MSJ Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.