Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Lg 55 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Corp, Robert Macwilliams, Croglio, Christina Marie, Keller, Amy Christine, Krull, Gregory Peter, Weisbeck, Richard Patrick, (total of 5) See All against Joseph A. Grasso, represented by Carson, Angela Mae, Myers, Laura Anne, Schwartzott, Jennifer Marie, Wolford, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Charles A. Schiano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles A. Schiano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 09, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 06, 2021DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 10, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005) Correspondence dated 7/13/21
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 16, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: April 23, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2020ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 01, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 28, 2020ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 31, 2020DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 05, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 30, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 28, 2020ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 29, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 29, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 12, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 28, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 19, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 19, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 25, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 27, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #006) Deposition of LG 55 Doe, page 89
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #006) Deposition of LG 55 Doe, page 83
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #006) Deposition of LG 55 Doe; pages 72-75
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #006) Deposition of LG 55 Doe, pages 51-52
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #006) Deposition of LG 55 Doe; page 49
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #006) Affidavit of Dr. Halligan
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: March 03, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 20, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 13, 2021RJI (AMENDED)
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10) *Corrected*
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #10) *Corrected*
Date: February 23, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #9) *Corrected*
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9) *Corrected*
Date: February 23, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER - PROTECTION
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 22, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G-2 Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G-1 Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B-2 Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B-1 Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #12) *Corrected*
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 02, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 27, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 27, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 |
ORDER - OTHER Signed order regarding NYSCEF documents |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #12) *Corrected* Transcript of Response to Jury's Questions and Re-reading of Certain Jury Instructions |
||
April 12, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #12) *Corrected* Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Omnibus Post-Trial Motion |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #12) *Corrected* Verdict Sheet |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #12) *Corrected* Transcripts of Excerpts of Jury Instructions |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #12) *Corrected* Transcript Excerpt of Charge Conference |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #12) *Corrected* Trial Testimony |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G-2 (Motion #12) *Corrected* Transcript Excerpt |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G-1 (Motion #12) *Corrected* Transcript Excerpt |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #12) *Corrected* Trial Testimony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.