Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Gavlik, Amy, Sheerin, John J, Valle, Jonathan Irving, against Donna Marie Rugino, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 01, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 26, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1) Notice of default letter and AOS
Date: May 26, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
June 16, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
June 12, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) letter withdrawing motion |
||
June 01, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) proposed order |
||
May 26, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
May 26, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of service and blueback |
||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) PAYMENT HISTORY |
||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Notice of default letter and AOS Notice of default letter and AOS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.