Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas As Indenture Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Saxon Asset Securities Trust 2004-3 Mortgage Loan Asset Backed Notes, Series 2004-3, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Austin Carter A K A Austin C. Carter, Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, Denise C. Carter A K A Denise Treuthart, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property, Described In The Complaint, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 30, 2021RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 23, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 28, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: December 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 |
ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE Transferring Case to Master Calendar |
||
July 12, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 12, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
June 28, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Foreclosure Settlement Conference Notice |
||
June 21, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for Settlement Conference |
||
November 23, 2021 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI |
||
November 23, 2021 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AUSTIN CARTER |
||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AUSTIN CARTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.