Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Amy Hassett, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Robert B Wiggins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 02, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time401 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 23, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 14, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 05, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 11, 2018JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 23, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: December 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF
Date: December 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: December 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: December 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 11, 2018DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: December 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFECT CHECKLIST | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.