Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
One West Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mahabamunuge, Bhanuka Yasaswin, Salter, Timothy William, Swanson, Adam Michael, against City Of New York, Jane Doe Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, John Doe, New York City Environmental Control Board, Trenia Johnson, (total of 5) See All represented by Routh, Matthew J., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCenceria Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: July 05, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023MEMORANDUM
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 05, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: June 12, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
October 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE MOTION SEQUENCE 2 AND 3 |
||
July 20, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate and Restore |
||
July 05, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
July 05, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #3) (RJI WAS ALREADY PAID FOR, THIS IS A NON-ELECTRONIC CASE CONVERTED TO NYSCEF) |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #3) Proposed Verified Answer of Non-Party |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #3) Deed of Subject Property to Non-Party |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #3) Sponsor Memo to FAPA |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #3) Foreclosure Abuse Prevention Act ("FAPA") |
||
July 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #3) Notice of Appearance (Quiet Title Action) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.