Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nimkoff Rosenfeld & Schechter, Llp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Browser, Adam Lawrence, against Bank Of America, N.A., International Bris Association, Inc, Levi Heber, represented by Epstein, David Z., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIngrid Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Debtor Creditor Law/Order) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 04, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 04, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: January 12, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 14, 2022ORDER - EXPARTE *Corrected*
Date: December 19, 2022ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 12, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: January 12, 2023RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT
Date: December 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 02, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Stipulation of Pre-Judgment attachement |
||
February 02, 2023 | Affidavit of Service for Bank of America (OSC) | ||
February 02, 2023 | Affidavit of Service for International Bris (OSC) | ||
February 02, 2023 | Affidavit of Service for Levi Heber (OSC) | ||
January 30, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2) SIGNED OSC |
||
January 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service: International Bris Association Inc. |
||
January 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service: Levi Heber |
||
January 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Excerpts from Transcript |
||
January 12, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.