Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rodney Jackson, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Rosenbaum, Craig Daniel, against New York City Transit Authority, represented by Joseph-St. Bernard, Jamila E., , in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with ROSEMARIE MONTALBANO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROSEMARIE MONTALBANO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management55 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 22, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 18, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 02, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 03, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) BP Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 02, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 24, 2020NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 11/18/22 |
||
March 08, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter requesting case to be stayed Redacted per 22 NYCRR Letter requesting case to be stayed Redacted |
||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
November 25, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) CITY DISCOVERY MOTION Judge: CITY DISCOVERY PART 7 |
|
November 24, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
November 24, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Courtesy Copy of PC Response Email |
||
November 17, 2020 | Hearing |
CITY DISCOVERY COMPLAINCE CONF
Judge: ROSEMARIE MONTALBANO, PT 7 |
|
October 25, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
September 18, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: CITY DISCOVERY PART 7 |
|
August 19, 2020 | Motion |
STRIKE PLEADINGS (Motion #001) Before Justice: CITY DISCOVERY PART 7 Answer demanded: Yes Judge: CITY DISCOVERY PART 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.