Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jacob Gold, Yisroel Eckstein, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suslovich, Jacob F, against Meir D. Tabak, Zev Landau A K A Wolfe Landau, represented by Fortuna, Nicholas Joseph, Lopez, Paula, Muoio, Megan Jeane, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Leon Ruchelsman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE EMERGENCY APPLICATION (PROPOSED)
Date: November 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 06, 2023STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: October 23, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 06, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 06, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 17, 2023PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 02, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
November 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
November 09, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
November 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation of Nicholas Fortuna |
||
November 06, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE EMERGENCY APPLICATION (PROPOSED) | ||
November 06, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Order Confirming Arbitration Award |
||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Petition with Exhibits |
||
November 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter opposing emergency application for temporary restraining order and requesting opportunity to Letter opposing emergency application for temporary restraining order and requesting opportunity to ... show more |
||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Rabbinical Court Letter 10/30/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.