Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Regina Caver As Administrator Of The Estate Of Girdine Caver Aka Girdine Caver Villarroel, Deceased,, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ross, Cye Ellis, against Henry Tischler M.D, John-Jane Doe, The New York Methodist Hospital, represented by Blalock, Miller Kathryn, Bogdani, Doris, Cooperman, Jennifer Shirah, Karp, Paul J., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bernard J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time1319 days |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: January 04, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #6)
Date: October 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #6)
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #5)
Date: April 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5)
Date: January 04, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: January 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4)
Date: January 17, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 21, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: December 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #4)
Date: December 03, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: December 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3)
Date: February 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: February 14, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: January 31, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 22, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: October 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: October 18, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: October 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: October 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 07, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 19, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #007) MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
August 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #007) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
August 13, 2020 | Motion |
(Motion #007) Decided: 10/08/2020Granted Before Justice: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha Answer demanded: No Judge: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha |
|
July 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART Judge: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha |
|
March 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART @2:15PM (Conversion) Judge: Steinhardt, Hon. Marsha |
|
December 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART @2:15PM (Conversion) Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
November 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
October 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #006) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART CCP (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to withdraw Motion Sequence 6 |
|
October 11, 2019 | Motion |
Strike Pleadings (Motion #006) Decided: 10/28/2019Withdrawn Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.