Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Bhrac-Ac Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schoenstein, Richard C, Temchin, Jonathan Eric, against For My Own Entertainment Llc, Kevin Cooke, Ricky Holms, Sidney R. Selby Iii, Steven Victor, (total of 5) See All represented by Gordon, Larry Martin, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Ruchelsman, Hon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time453 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 07, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 07, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 28, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 15, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 26, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 07, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 21, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 24, 2017REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: February 08, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 19, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) COMMERCIAL PART 8 9:30 (Conversion) Judge: Ruchelsman, Hon. Leon |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 31, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 8 9:30 (Conversion) Judge: Ruchelsman, Hon. Leon |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
October 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 8 9:30 (Conversion) Judge: Ruchelsman, Hon. Leon |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Demand for Statements and Photographs |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Demand for Witness Information |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E copy of 3rd Party Complaint |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.