Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Earth Construction Corp., filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Hirschel, Daniel E, against Hudson Insurance Company, New York City School Construction Authority, represented by Fryman, Robert J., Johnson, Jamie Brody, Papandrea, Amanda Marie, Sheehy, Christopher John, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property - Foreclosure On Mechanic'S Lien |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeLiens |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time574 days |
ANSWER
Date: December 27, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 18, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 29, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: June 29, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 10, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 27, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 02, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 02, 2016NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: May 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION First Request for Production and Inspection |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Mechanic's Lien |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.