Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
James Edouard Dieubon v. Sethia L. Moore
On October 02, 2018 a torts - motor vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 24, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Pamela L;Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Appealed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: Feb 08, 2023DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Jan 31, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Jan 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 2)
Date: Nov 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 2)
Date: Nov 30, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Nov 14, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Sep 27, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: Jul 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 2)
Date: Feb 01, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: Feb 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Feb 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 2)
Date: Feb 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Feb 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 2)
Date: Feb 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Feb 01, 2022ORDER - OTHER (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 16, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jun 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: Jun 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Jun 29, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: Jun 29, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 03, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Apr 28, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: Dec 11, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 06, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: Dec 05, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Dec 05, 2019ANSWER
Date: Oct 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 30, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
January 31, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 11, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 30, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) affirmation in opposition |
||
November 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) police accident report |
||
November 14, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 12.01.2022 Motion Notice and Calendar |
||
September 27, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 10.13.2022 Motion Notice and Calendar |
||
July 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 17, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 6.2.2022 Motion Notice and Calendar |
||
February 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Affidavit of Plaintiff |
||
February 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
February 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint |
||
February 01, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
February 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Answer |
||
February 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 07/23/2021 |
||
July 16, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
June 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Orders |
||
June 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
June 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
May 03, 2021 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 4/27/2021 |
||
April 28, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
December 03, 2020 | hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART FADR (Conversion) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
April 13, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned Final Adr Part CCP 5/1 (Conversion) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
March 10, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned General-Alternative Dispute CCP 5/15/20 (Conversion) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 01/14/2020 |
|
January 14, 2020 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Fisher, Hon. Pamela L. |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE To Preliminary Conference Request |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |