Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Board Of Managers Of The City View Condominium, As Agent For The Unit Owners, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Buss, Jeffrey D, Malley, John Joseph, Smith, Matthew James, Stewart, Jennifer L, Welcome, Charles Stephen, (total of 5) See All against Michelle Mchugh A Executrix For The Estate Of Michael Mchugh, Val-Hugh Capital Corp., represented by Ferrari, Joan, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Peter Paul presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Breach Of Contract; Fraud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 02, 2018ANSWER
Date: June 13, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: February 25, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 31, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 03, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 14, 2019ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 22, 2019ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2019ANSWER
Date: August 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 25, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: November 26, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2019SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: October 02, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2019NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 19, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 21, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 01, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 26, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 06, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 15, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER final pre note dated 12/5/22 |
||
December 01, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Final Pre-Note Order |
||
May 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
May 03, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Post Deposition Demand |
||
April 15, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: post-deposition demands on 3rd party defendant |
||
April 08, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: post-deposition demands to defendants |
||
February 25, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 2/17/22 |
||
February 17, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 05, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Dated: 12/22/2021 |
||
December 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affidavit in Opposition of Michelle McHugh |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.