Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Prestige Home Fitness, Llc A K A Gymguyz Bay Ridge, Prestige Home Fitness, Llc A K A Gymguyz Bay Ridge, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kopelevich, Mikhail, Landfair, David Michael, against Gymguyz Franchising, Llc, represented by Bolton, David, Kourland, Nancy L., Lasser, Stephen Michael, Stiell, Heather Sherry, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Carolyn E Wade presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 20, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 30, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 08, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 25, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 21, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 21, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 22, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 21, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: December 29, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 31, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 26, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 15, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 29, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #6) Opening papers Motion Seq. No. 3 |
||
September 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #6) Reply papers Motion Seq. No. 3 |
||
September 15, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
September 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #6) Decision in American Transit v. North Shore |
||
August 23, 2023 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
July 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B E-mail dated March 21 |
||
July 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Stipulation |
||
July 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Affirmation in Reply |
||
July 03, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 30, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.