Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sonia Ayala, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Filippazzo, Stefano A., Kubick, Richard Anton, against Boro Transit, Inc., Isabella Malcangi, Merckendol Guerrier, represented by Conquest, Deborah Anne, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 15, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 31, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: February 09, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
March 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) EXA - Summons and Complaint |
||
March 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) EXB - Affidavit of Service |
||
March 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) EXE - Nonmilitary Affidavit |
||
March 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) EXC - Affidavit of Sonia Ayala |
||
March 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) EXD - Letter to Defendant |
||
February 16, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 09, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected* AYALA - CENTRAL COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.