Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Luis Alberto Herrera, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Huttner, Lee Michael, Subin, Herbert S, against Belmont Re, Llc, Sutter Avenue Realty Co. Llc, The City Of New York, Trinchese Iron Works & Construction Inc, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Newman, Jon E., Rocco, Daniel P., Warshaw, Jason David, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp22 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 30, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 16, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 12, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 20, 2020THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 19, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 30, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 30, 2020MEMORANDUM
Date: December 15, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 30, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 30, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 23, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 20, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: October 20, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: October 20, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 16, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 19, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 28, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 23, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: May 19, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: April 19, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 02, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 21, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 21, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 02, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint |
||
December 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service |
||
December 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) EXHIBIT F - Decision dtd 04-12-22 |
||
December 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) EXHIBIT C - Third-Party Summons and Complaint and Verified Answer |
||
December 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) EXHIBIT B - Verified Answer |
||
December 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) EXHIBIT A - Summons and Complaint dtd 07-12-20 |
||
December 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) EXHIBIT E - Compliance Conference Order dtd 02-28-22 |
||
December 02, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion to Restore |
||
December 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Support |
||
December 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) EXHIBIT D - Case Scheduling Order dtd 4-19-21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.