Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
German Prado, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Schiowitz, Martin, against Building Dev Corp, North Flats Llc, The North Flats Llc, represented by Mcmanus, Kurtis Robert, Rudnicki, Evan Brett, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Carl J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time652 days |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 15, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 19, 2015DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 19, 2015ANSWER
Date: March 19, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 28, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART STD, 05312016 (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
June 15, 2016 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
October 23, 2015 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dtd 10/14/15, Filed 10/16/15 nsp. |
||
October 14, 2015 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Partnow, Hon. Mark I. |
|
September 10, 2015 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 10, 2015 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
June 12, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Notice of Appearance and Consent to Change Attorney |
||
June 12, 2015 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
June 12, 2015 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
March 19, 2015 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Witness Information and Reports |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.